Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the scope of a specified procedure in law that authorizes Baltimore City to apply to a specified State agency in order to extinguish or redeem a ground rent on property acquired by Baltimore City under specified circumstances; altering the contents of a specified affidavit required in the procedure to extinguish or redeem a ground rent on property acquired by Baltimore City under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM