Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Boyce, Buckel, Cardin, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, R. Lewis, Lierman, McComas, Smith, Solomon, Valderrama, D. Barnes, Boteler, C. Branch, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hartman, Hornberger, Ivey, Kaiser, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 231
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide technical assistance to small businesses in the State seeking grants under certain federal programs; requiring small businesses to meet certain qualifications for participation in the Program; authorizing the Corporation, in accordance with certain provisions of law, to procure a nonprofit organization located in the State to provide services under the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {785661/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 231
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {785661/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 231
Text - Chapter - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM