Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the rights of a subscriber for shares of stock of a corporation; providing that an individual, whether or not then a director, may assent to an action by a consent that will be effective at a future time under specified circumstances; providing that a person, whether or not then a stockholder, may assent to an action by a consent that will be effective at a future date that is no later than 60 days after the consent is delivered to the corporation or its agent; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0681
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383099/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {383099/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-202, 2-408, 2-505, 3-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM