Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specialized curriculum for school resource officers and school security employees to include training in certain matters; requiring that beginning on September 1, 2021, a school resource office or school security employee meet certain qualifications; requiring the Maryland Center for School Safety to develop a specialized curriculum and offer training to certain supervisors and administrators; requiring a local school system that employs a security employee to establish a certain complaint process; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0327 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675865/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-42)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {675865/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-42) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page