Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama and Hettleman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring all units in the Executive, Judicial, and Legislative branches of State government, including all units with independent personnel systems, to provide certain reasonable accommodations for an employee with certain limitations caused or contributed to by pregnancy or childbirth; prohibiting units of State government, under certain circumstances, from requiring an employee to take certain leave or requiring an employee to accept certain accommodations under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0225
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 233
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:56 PM