Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Barron, Chang, Frick, Frush, Healey, Hixson, Jalisi, Kelly, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Luedtke, Morales, Morhaim, Patterson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Aumann, Barkley, Brooks, Fennell, Glenn, Lisanti, and C. Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person to have an appropriate license whenever the person acts in the State as an electronic nicotine delivery systems manufacturer, retailer, vape shop vendor, wholesaler distributor, or wholesaler importer; providing for specified application procedures and fees; requiring the Comptroller to issue electronic nicotine delivery systems licenses; requiring the Comptroller to pay specified fees into the General Fund of the State; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0119
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563499/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-11)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {973023/3 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-13)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Licensing
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {563499/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (126-11) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {397275/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {973023/3 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted 69
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-13) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Text - Chapter - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.7-101 through 16.7-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM