Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Jacobs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified provision of law that prohibits a person from keeping for sale any unfrozen crab meat, any frozen crab meat, or any pasteurized crab meat at temperatures that exceed specified maximum temperatures.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36
Text - Third - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Finance 37
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM