Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Bagnall, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person, subject to certain limitations, to directly or indirectly advertise for or solicit business in the State for a diagnostic laboratory test or procedure ordered by a physician and performed by a medical laboratory that is certified under 42 U.S.C. § 263a; requiring a certain person to disclose that a certain laboratory test may or may not be covered by insurance; authorizing the Secretary of Health to take legal action to restrict the marketing of a diagnostic laboratory test under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0495
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {146186/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {146186/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM