Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Workgroup Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Patterson, Crosby, Fennell, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the deadline for the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program Workgroup to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly from December 1, 2019, to December 1, 2020; and extending the termination provision of the Workgroup from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2021.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Education - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Workgroup Extension
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-308 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM