Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Board of Elections)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering required provisions to be included in the constitution and bylaws of political parties, as specified; altering to not later than the first Monday in July the date by which candidates for public office must file a declaration of intent, as specified; altering the number of petition signatures a candidate who seeks nomination by petition must file to appear on the general election ballot; requiring a specified governmental entity to provide the State Board of Elections with specified information regarding specified persons; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {415160/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {415160/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Rules 41
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 14-107, 15-104, 4-204, 5-703, 5-703.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM