Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Krebs, R. Lewis, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist to administer certain vaccinations to an individual that is at least 9 years old but under the age of 18 years under certain circumstances; altering the age of an individual to whom a pharmacist may administer certain vaccinations; requiring a pharmacist to administer certain vaccinations under a written protocol; authorizing a pharmacist to administer certain vaccinations to an adult; repealing a requirement that a certain written protocol be vaccine specific; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0355
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page