Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Payment of State Employee Wages - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Anderton, Bartlett, Buckel, Cullison, Hettleman, Jones, Lierman, Luedtke, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Solomon, Terrasa, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law requiring the Central Payroll Bureau of the Office of the State Comptroller to establish certain pay periods and pay certain employees at certain intervals, requiring appointing authorities to report certain payroll information to the Bureau in a certain manner, requiring the Bureau and the appointing authorities to provide certain information to each employee, establishing a certain grievance procedure, and allowing certain damages.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-38)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Payment of State Employee Wages - Repeal of Sunset Provision
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - State Personnel - Payment of State Employee Wages - Repeal of Sunset Provision
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (101-38) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Reassigned to Finance 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Payment of State Employee Wages - Repeal of Sunset Provision
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-402, 2-402, 2-406, 2-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM