Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, Dumais, Hettleman, Korman, Lehman, Pena-Melnyk, Solomon, Haynes, Jackson, Jones, and Lierman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to include the Secretary of Commerce ex officio, one member each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House, and one additional student member; requiring the Board to make certain meetings available to the public by live and archived video streaming; requiring the Board to review certain annual financial disclosure statements; requiring the Board to provide education and training on its governance policies; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0719
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714432/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {714432/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-103, 12-104, 12-108, 12-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM