Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - State Aid for School Construction - Eligible Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Anderton, Arentz, Beitzel, Hornberger, Jacobs, Krimm, Mautz, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to adopt regulations that include certain land acquisition and architectural, engineering, consulting, and other planning costs as eligible public school construction or capital improvement costs that may be funded or paid by the State under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0519
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - State Aid for School Construction - Eligible Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Schools - State Aid for School Construction - Eligible Costs
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page