Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Barve, Cullison, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Healey, Hixson, Jones, Moon, and Platt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Potomac Compact for Fair Representation; providing that a compacting state is not required to comply with the Compact under certain circumstances; establishing the Congressional Districting Commission; requiring the Executive Director of the Department of Legislative Services to determine the size and composition of the Commission and, on or before June 1 of the year following the decennial census, select the members of the Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM