Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Delegate Buckel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the alteration of the distribution of proceeds from video lottery terminals at a facility in Allegany County after 10 years of operations at the facility.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0437
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-01, 9-1A-26, 9-1A-27 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM