Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facility - Credit Extensions to Patrons - Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery Commission to adopt regulations prohibiting a video lottery operation licensee from extending more than $500 in credit to a patron of a video lottery facility within a 24-hour period.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM