Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in St. Mary's County a beauty salon beer and wine license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a person who holds a beauty salon permit; authorizing a holder of the license to sell or serve not more than specified amounts of beer and wine for on-premises consumption by a beauty salon customer under specified circumstances; establishing a $300 license fee; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0137 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   28-1001, 28-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM