Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Cassilly and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to use reusable diverted water on the site on which it originates for purposes such as gardening, composting, lawn watering, and irrigation in accordance with certain requirements; and defining "reusable diverted water" to mean water that is generated by backwashing an on-site potable water treatment system or using an ice maker, is collected for reuse instead of discharged to a residential on-site sewage disposal system, and contains no constituents that are harmful to public health or environment.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {400817/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {400817/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text - Chapter - Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM