Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0543


CH0239

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari, Arikan, Bagnall, Cardin, Charles, Cullison, Forbes, Henson, Hettleman, Jalisi, Johnson, Kipke, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and C. Watson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 239
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, following the discovery of a check to a decedent or the estate of a decedent payable for a sum not exceeding $1,000 after the estate is closed and the appointment of the personal representative is terminated, to enter an order authorizing a certain interested person to indorse and deposit the check into the interested person's bank account for the limited purpose of distributing the funds in a certain manner; providing that a hearing is not required before a court may enter a certain order; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0151
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {512319/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 239
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {512319/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 239
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:14 PM