Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Practicing Veterinary Medicine Without a License - Cease and Desist Order and Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Griffith, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Beitzel, Boyce, Buckel, Charkoudian, Corderman, Ebersole, Hartman, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Moon, Otto, Palakovich Carr, Parrott, Reilly, Shetty, Shoemaker, Szeliga, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, on review and approval of the Secretary of Agriculture or the Secretary's designee, the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to issue a cease and desist order and impose a certain civil penalty against a person who practices, attempts to practice, or offers to practice veterinary medicine without a license; specifying that a civil penalty imposed under the Act may not exceed $5,000 for each violation; requiring the Board to consider certain factors in setting the amount of a civil penalty; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Practicing Veterinary Medicine Without a License - Cease and Desist Order and Civil Penalty
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 17
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-313.2 )
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 9:14 AM