Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $20,000,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Carroll County and to effect such borrowing by issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0555
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 31
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2014 3/19/2014 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM