Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis, McCray, and J. Lewis
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the prevailing wage law to apply to structures or works, including bridges, buildings, ditches, roads, alleys, waterworks, or sewage disposal plants, funded with certain bond proceeds in tax increment financing development districts created on or after July 1, 2018; providing that the prevailing wage law applies to certain structures or works only if authorized by a political subdivision, Baltimore City, or the Revenue Authority of Prince George's County; applying the Act only to contracts executed on or after July 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0278
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113992/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-48)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {113992/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-48) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817
Text - Chapter - Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM