Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, B. Barnes, Beidle, Carey, Chang, Frush, Gaines, Holmes, Pena-Melnyk, Simonaire, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, and A. Washington
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a privately owned transportation project in the State that includes the construction of one or more tunnels with a diameter of 6 feet or greater that will be primarily used by a common carrier may not be constructed and the State may not authorize the use of or access to a State-owned right-of-way or State property for the privately owned transportation project, under certain circumstances; and providing for the construction of the Act.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1073
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930510/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {593524/1 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-37)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (34-11)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-11)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {930510/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {593524/1 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Text - Third - Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {517172/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (100-37) 70
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Limit Debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (34-11) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (29-11) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM