Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Nonresident Senior and Junior Hunting Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a nonresident senior hunting license; authorizing a nonresident to purchase the license beginning in the calendar year in which the nonresident attains the age of 65; and establishing a $65 fee for the license; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to submit a specified report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {450111/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {450111/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM