Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Malone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain notice in a certain forfeiture proceeding to be prominently posted for 30 consecutive days on an official website of the county in which the action is pending as an alternative to publishing the notice in a certain newspaper.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1129 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672215/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {672215/1 Adopted 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM