Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a register of wills to waive certain fees for the administration of an estate if certain real property subject to administration in the State is to be transferred to a certain individual or is encumbered by a lien and subject to sale under certain provisions of law, and the estate is unable to pay the fees by reason of poverty; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0466
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {596187/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {668974/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morales, Barron and Morgan)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morales, Barron and Morgan)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Cassilly and Lee)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Cassilly and Lee)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {593329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {593329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {596187/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {668974/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morales, Barron and Morgan) 61A
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morales, Barron and Morgan) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Cassilly and Lee) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Cassilly and Lee) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Conference Committee Report {593329/1 Adopted 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Conference Committee Report {593329/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM