Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Acevero, Bagnall, Bridges, Cain, Carr, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pendergrass, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, C. Watson, Wilkins, P. Young, and Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Applying certain laws regarding net energy metering and community solar generating systems to customers served by a community choice aggregator; altering the circumstances under which counties and municipal corporations may act as an aggregator; establishing a certain Community Choice Aggregator Pilot Program; establishing a process by which, beginning on October 1, 2022, a certain county may form a community choice aggregator; requiring a certain county to develop a plan and give notice of a certain aggregation plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0315
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0730 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633193/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-37)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {633193/1 Adopted 47
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (93-37) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 7-306, 7-306.2, 7-507, 7-510.3 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM