Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel (First Responders Tax Benefit Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Hornberger, Long, Mangione, Metzgar, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum number of points, categories of points, and minimum length of service required for an individual to be eligible for a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for service in certain volunteer fire, rescue, or emergency medical services; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel (First Responders Tax Benefit Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 8:10 AM