Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Ivey, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Smith, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or a corporation to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain costs incurred for an approved lead hazard reduction project for qualifying property located in Baltimore City; providing for the calculation of the credit; providing for the submission of proposals for lead hazard reduction projects to the Department of Housing and Community Development for approval; limiting to $250,000 the total amount of credits that the Department may approve for any fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0956 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM