Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - Mobile Barbershops and Beauty Salons - Permit Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "barbershop" to include a mobile barbershop; requiring an applicant for a mobile barbershop permit to hold a permit to operate a nonmobile barbershop and to lease or own a vehicle or trailer in which the mobile barbershop is located; altering the definition of "beauty salon" to include a mobile beauty salon; requiring an applicant for a mobile beauty salon permit to hold a nonmobile beauty salon permit and to lease or own the motor vehicle or trailer in which the mobile beauty salon is located; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394839/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {394839/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 54
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Passed Enrolled 57
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-502, 5-101, 5-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM