Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Bartlett, Wilkins, Acevero, Barron, Brooks, Charkoudian, Charles, D.M. Davis, Dumais, Feldmark, Hettleman, Ivey, J. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Queen, Shetty, Smith, Stewart, Turner, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each correctional facility to disseminate certain written information directly to each eligible voter regarding voter registration, absentee voting, and certain applications and provide an absentee ballot to an eligible voter on request; requiring the Board of Elections to provide correctional facilities with certain written materials; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide each individual who is released from a facility with a voter registration application; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0372
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {895162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-36)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {895162/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (93-36) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-501, 2-502 )
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:19 AM