Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Anderson, Barron, Crutchfield, Hill, Krebs, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Johnson, Kerr, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Health and the Secretary of Aging, or their designees, cochair the Council; requiring the members of the Council to select the chair of the council; requiring the Council to update the State plan, examine the needs of certain individuals and identify methods to meet those needs, provide advice to the Governor and the General Assembly, and develop and promote brain health strategies; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876886/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {876886/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Finance 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text - Chapter - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3201, 13-3203, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207 )
(   2013, 2016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM