Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, for any fiscal year that an appropriation is included in the State budget for a third bridge that crosses the Chesapeake Bay, the Governor include in the budget certain capital grants for each county in which the bridge originates or terminates; requiring that the capital grants equal 25% of the amount appropriated for certain purposes related to the bridge; requiring that a capital grant be used only for infrastructure improvements necessitated by or related to the construction of the bridge; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 11:12 AM