Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - Volunteer First Responders
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Ciliberti, Hornberger, Long, Mangione, Metzgar, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing certain volunteer first responders to enroll and participate as covered employees in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; defining "volunteer first responder" as a person engaged in providing emergency medical care or rescue services on a volunteer basis; and authorizing the State to charge a county or municipal corporation certain costs resulting from certain covered employees participating in the Program.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - Volunteer First Responders
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 8:35 AM