Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to make available a certain form; requiring certain biosafety level 3 (BSL-3) laboratories to report certain information to the Department on or before October 30 each year; requiring the Department to report the number and location by local jurisdiction of BSL-3 laboratories to certain agencies and officials on or before December 31 each year; providing that certain information is confidential and not subject to inspection under the Public Information Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0450
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 12:40 PM