Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate D.M. Davis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the process under which the Child Support Administration is authorized to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration of an individual's child support arrearages for the purpose of suspending the individual's driver's license or privilege to drive; repealing the process under which the Motor Vehicle Administration is required to suspend an individual's driver's license or privilege to drive on certain notice that the individual has child support arrearages; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page