Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority and the University System of Maryland, by regulation, to establish certain procedures for each bidder, contractor, or subcontractor that performs work on certain construction projects to certify that the bidder, contractor, or subcontractor pays certain employee health care expenses; authorizing a certain bidder, contractor, or subcontractor to demonstrate the payment of certain employee health care expenses in a certain manner on or before July 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/4/2020 1:48 PM