Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Crosby, Ebersole, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jalisi, Lehman, R. Lewis, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, Wilson, K. Young, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Johnson, Kerr, Krebs, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maternal Mortality Review Program, in consultation with the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities, to make recommendations to reduce disparities in the maternal mortality rate including recommendations related to social determinants of health; requiring the Secretary of Health to include in the annual report regarding the Maternal Mortality Review Program a section on racial disparities that compares mortality rates, the number of live births by race and a comparison of leading causes of death by race; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0356
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Reporting Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296882/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Reporting Requirement
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {296882/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Finance 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Text - Chapter - Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1204, 13-1207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM