Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to adopt regulations on or before June 30, 2016, to prohibit on property under its jurisdiction the smoking of a cigarette, a cigar, or any other tobacco product; providing for a specified exclusion; and requiring that the regulations provide that specified penalties be imposed for specified infractions.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1334 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253590/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-45)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {253590/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (87-51) 50
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {737479/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (93-45) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM