Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Anderson, Frick, Gutierrez, Hixson, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, A. Miller, Queen, M. Washington, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Farms and Families Program in the Department of Agriculture; establishing that the purpose of the Program is to double the purchasing power of food-insecure Maryland residents with limited access to fresh fruits and vegetables and to increase revenue for farmers through redemption of specified benefits at Maryland farmers markets; establishing a Maryland Farms and Families Fund; requiring the Governor to include a $500,000 appropriation to the Fund each fiscal year subject to the limitations of the State budget; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0278
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724563/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/14 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Farms and Families Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Farms and Families Act
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {724563/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/14 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted 43
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Maryland Farms and Families Act
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Text - Chapter - Maryland Farms and Families Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-2001 through 10-2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM