Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Solar Photovoltaic Systems – Lockout Tag Requirement and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a company that installs solar photovoltaic systems to install a certain lockout tag containing a safety warning under certain circumstances; and requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to make a certain report to the House Economic Matters Committee and the Senate Finance Committee by December 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1486 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Solar Photovoltaic Systems - Lockout Tag Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Solar Photovoltaic Systems - Lockout Tag Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487370/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Safety - Solar Photovoltaic Systems - Lockout Tag Requirement
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Public Safety - Solar Photovoltaic Systems - Lockout Tag Requirement
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {487370/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Solar Photovoltaic Systems – Lockout Tag Requirement and Study
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Solar Photovoltaic Systems – Lockout Tag Requirement and Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM