Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Boyce, Brooks, Chang, Griffith, Guyton, Haynes, Kittleman, Metzgar, Mosby, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain vendors who are qualified job training organizations to claim a credit for the expense of collecting and paying the sales and use tax; prohibiting a vendor from claiming certain credits against the sales and use tax if the vendor claims a certain credit; requiring a vendor to be certified as a qualified job training organization before claiming a certain credit; authorizing a vendor to submit a certain application to the Secretary of Labor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0448
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:26 AM