Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Ebersole, and Guyton
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Kagan)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the student member of the Baltimore County Board of Education to vote on matters relating to capital and operating budgets.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-17)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (114-17) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2B-05 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:57 PM