Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial, Jean B. Cryor Memorial, and Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarships – Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Bagnall, Crutchfield, Griffith, Hettleman, C. Jackson, Kerr, Rogers, and Williams
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for the Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and the Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program by removing the residency requirement for certain categories of individuals; altering the requirement of filing for federal and State financial aid for the Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflict Scholarship; prohibiting certain scholarships from being awarded after a certain date; authorizing certain scholarships to be renewed after a certain date; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174066/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Graduate Students and Other Alterations
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {174066/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial, Jean B. Cryor Memorial, and Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarships – Alterations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:23 AM