Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsored by
Delegates Patterson, Ali, Angel, D. Barnes, Barron, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Chang, Conaway, Davis, Fennell, Gaines, Gibson, Glenn, Haynes, C. Howard, Jackson, R. Lewis, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, Morales, Mosby, Platt, Proctor, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Turner, M. Washington, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission, in consultation with certain persons, to conduct research to advance the documentation of African American patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission to determine and send to the county boards of education certain information; requiring the Commission to develop and print a certain publication; terminating the Act on September 30, 2023; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0417
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {426682/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {426682/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-106, 7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM