Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from conditioning reimbursement of applied behavior analysis services provided to Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients on the presence or availability of the parent or caregiver of the Program recipient in the setting where the applied behavior analysis services are provided to the Program recipient; providing that a certain provision of the Act does not prohibit the Department from establishing reasonable standards for the involvement of a parent or caregiver; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0469
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756487/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {756487/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Finance 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page