Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Afzali, Arentz, Buckel, Clark, Corderman, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, Kipke, Kittleman, Long, Malone, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide certain boards with a list of recommended courses on the obligation to report abuse and neglect and the identification of abused and neglected children; requiring certain boards to post the course list prominently on the board's website, provide information about the recommended courses to health care professionals at the time of renewal of licensure , and advertise the availability of the recommended courses in certain media.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0131
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1198 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {202918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {202918/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM