Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Fisher, Adams, Arentz, Chisholm, Clark, Ghrist, Hartman, Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Malone, Miller, Morgan, Otto, and Saab
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to study and make recommendations regarding nuclear energy and its role as a renewable energy resource in the State; and requiring the Program to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020, its recommendations regarding initiatives for the State and the General Assembly to responsibly and efficiently grow the nuclear industry in the State, support for emerging nuclear energy technologies, and utilization of nuclear energy to combat climate change.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683493/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/20 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/21 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {653624/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-34)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Renewable Source - Nuclear Energy
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {683493/1 Adopted 50
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/20 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/21 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted 51
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Floor Amendment {653624/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 51A
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Text - Third - Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (102-34) 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Referred Rules 53
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM