Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard for 2019 to 2021 and later; and applying the Act retroactively to all renewable portfolio standard compliance years that begin on or after January 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343994/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343994/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {217572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Eligibility
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {343994/1 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {343994/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Alterations
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Finance 46
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {217572/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-703, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM